blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0716969

EP0716969 - Electrohydraulic braking system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit
Michigan 48202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard
Detroit Michigan 48202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Walenty, Allen John
48298 Tilch Road
Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US
02 / Kade, Alexander
1071 Hollywood
Grosse Point Woods, Michigan 48236 / US
03 / Leppek, Kevin Gerard
2194 South Shore Court
Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US
[1996/25]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John, et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]Denton, Michael John, et al
Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street
Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB
Application number, filing date95203184.720.11.1995
[1996/25]
Priority number, dateUS1994035546814.12.1994         Original published format: US 355468
[1996/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0716969
Date:19.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0716969
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:B60T8/00, B60T13/74
[1996/25]
CPC:
B60T13/745 (EP,US); B60T13/662 (EP,US); B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (EP,US); B60T8/4072 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/25]
TitleGerman:Elektrohydraulische Bremsanlage[1996/25]
English:Electrohydraulic braking system[1996/25]
French:Système de freinage électrohydraulique[1996/25]
Examination procedure19.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5320421  (KADE ALEXANDER [US], et al) [YD] 1,6 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 38 *;
 [Y]EP0317182  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2687969  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2,7 * page 6, line 14 - page 9, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4206238  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5312172  (TAKEUCHI HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 1 - line 52; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]WO9324353  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2053394  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [A] 4,9 * page 1, line 78 - line 95; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]DE3226074  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0478953  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US5312168  (BREEN MICHAEL T [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.