EP0706920 - A security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VECTA LIMITED Vecta House, Perry Way Witham Essex CM8 3SX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states VECTA LIMITED Vecta House, Perry Way Witham, Essex CM8 3SX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niriella, Dharmadasa Cedric 46 Ashworth Mansions Elgin Avenue, London W9 1JP / GB | 02 /
Stephen, David John 1 Parsons Street Adderbury, Oxford OX17 3LX / GB | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95203205.0 | 11.04.1989 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | GB19880008764 | 14.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8808764 | GB19880013722 | 09.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813722 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706920 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
B60R25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | Sicherungssystem | [1996/16] | English: | A security system | [1996/16] | French: | Système de sécurité | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/17] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89904827.6 / EP0415947 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4449605 (READ WILLIAM A [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3241071 (HILGER GEORG) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 17 - line 21; figure 2 *; | [A]US3004170 (ARNOLD GREENSPAN) [A] 2 * column W *; | [DA]US3714628 (SLOGER T) [DA] 2 * column W *; | [A]US3756341 (TONKOWICH W, et al) [A] 2 * column A; figures 1,3 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 2 *; | [DYA]GB2136620 (BALLANTINE BERNARD JOHN, et al) [DY] 7 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 21 * [A] 1,3; | [DYA]US4546266 (ZENICK WALTER N [US], et al) [DY] 7 * column A; figure - * * column 2, line 16 - line 23 * * column 4, line 42 - line 63 * [A] 3; | [XA]DE3620297 (HIRTZ HELMUT [DE]) [X] 8,10 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4,6 | by applicant | US3714628 | US4278963 | GB2136620 | US4546266 |