Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0743443 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2000 | B1 | EP0743443 | 20.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44158195 | 15.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69517678T | 19.10.2000 | T2 | DE69517678D1 | 03.08.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US44158195 | 15.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5609020 | 11.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US44158195 | 15.05.1995 |