EP0716237 - An anchor member for friable material and a method of implementing such a member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anquetin, Robert 15 rue Jean SebastienBach F-91580 Etrechy / FR | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [1997/17] | Stagg, Diana Christine, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Moffat, John Andrew Emhart Patents Department, Emhart International Limited, 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95203368.6 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | FR19940014767 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9414767 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716237 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716237 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/00 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
F16B13/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/24] | Title | German: | Verankerungselement für sprödes Material und Anwendungsverfahren eines solchen Elementes | [1996/24] | English: | An anchor member for friable material and a method of implementing such a member | [1996/24] | French: | Organe d'ancrage pour matériau friable et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'un tel organe | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00122271.0 / EP1072801 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0501201 (ALLFA DUEBEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,8 * column W * [Y] 2; | [X]DE4039831 (UPAT GMBH & CO) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2530306 (BRECHET MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9407039 (MCSHERRY THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [DA]US3911781 (BAPPERT ADOLF) [DA] 4 * column A; figure - * | by applicant | FR2530306 | EP0501201 |