EP0709602 - Method of calibrating clutches in transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon Essex SS14 3AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulgrien, Garth H. 2 Briar Wood Lane Epharata, PA 17522 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 95203370.2 | 28.11.1990 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19890444312 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: US 444312 | US19900501573 | 29.03.1990 Original published format: US 501573 | US19900521629 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521629 | US19900521630 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521630 | US19900521799 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521799 | US19900521808 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 521808 | US19900526157 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: US 526157 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709602 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709602 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709602 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
B60W30/18 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/10 (EP);
B60W30/1819 (EP);
F16H61/0246 (EP);
F16H61/0248 (EP);
F16H61/061 (EP);
B60W2540/14 (EP);
F16H2059/006 (EP);
F16H2059/0239 (EP);
F16H2059/088 (EP);
F16H2059/6807 (EP);
F16H2061/0087 (EP);
F16H2061/0216 (EP);
F16H2312/00 (EP);
F16H2312/02 (EP);
F16H2312/022 (EP);
F16H2312/08 (EP);
F16H2342/042 (EP);
F16H59/42 (EP);
F16H59/46 (EP);
F16H59/56 (EP);
F16H61/0059 (EP);
F16H61/0213 (EP);
F16H61/682 (EP);
F16H61/684 (EP);
F16H61/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1996/18] | F16H61/06, B60K41/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/18] | Title | German: | Eichverfahren für Kupplungen in Getrieben | [1996/18] | English: | Method of calibrating clutches in transmissions | [1996/18] | French: | Méthode d'étalonnage pour embrayages de transmission | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90203141.8 / EP0431677 | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4646891 (BRAUN EUGENE R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4855913 (BREKKESTRAN KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3 * * column 26, line 5 - column 27, line 30 *; | [A]US4653350 (DOWNS ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 12, line 56 - column 16, line 46; figures 3,7-9 *; | [A]EP0327004 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * page 19, lines 5-16; figures 4,11,18 * |