EP0780419 - Multi-functional site containing polymers, and applications thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLAND BIOMATERIALS GROUP B.V. Drienerlolaan 5 NL-7522 NB Enschede / NL | [1997/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engbers, Gerardus Henricus Maria Vlaanderenlaan 3 NL-7577 MB Oldenzaal / NL | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1997/26] | Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95203602.8 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780419 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00, A61L27/00, A61L33/00, C12N11/08, C08G85/00 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
C12N11/087 (EP,US);
A61F2/14 (US);
A61K8/042 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/8147 (EP);
A61K8/84 (EP);
A61K8/90 (EP);
A61L27/16 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L33/0029 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C08B37/0075 (EP);
C08G73/0206 (EP);
C08G85/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L33/02 (EP);
A61L27/18, A61F2/14, C08L79/02, C08L33/02 (EP);
A61L27/18, C08L79/02 (EP);
A61L33/0029, C08L33/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1997/39] |
Former [1997/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polymere mit multifunktionalen Stellen und deren Verwendungen | [1997/26] | English: | Multi-functional site containing polymers, and applications thereof | [1997/26] | French: | Polymères contenant des sites multi-fonctions et leurs applications | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, ES, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/07] | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.02.1997 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.1998 | 31.12.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2002 | 31.12.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2003 | 31.12.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9220349 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1,15,22-24,32 *; | [Y]US3616935 (LOVE JIM, et al) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1,10 *; | [Y]US5132108 (NARAYANAN PALLASSANA V [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0294905 (SENTRON V O F [NL]) [Y] 1-26 * column 1, line 24 - line 25; claims 1,11-13,15,16,18,31,32 *; | [Y] - A.M.JENDRYCHOWSKA-BONAMOUR, "Hydrogels Préparés par le greffage Radiochimique pour l'Immobilisation des Enzymes.", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, NEW YORK US, (1983), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 2589 - 2596, XP002005094 [Y] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1983.170210839 |