EP0691189 - A support panel for a rotary paper cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISKARS OY AB Mannerheimintie 14 A FIN-00101 Helsinki 10 / FI | [1996/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boda, James C. S7680 High Point Drive Merrimac, WI 53561 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250132.8 | 02.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | US19940262308 | 20.06.1994 Original published format: US 262308 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691189 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/20, B26D7/02 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
B23D35/008 (EP,US);
B26D1/185 (EP,US);
B26D5/02 (EP,US);
B26D7/20 (EP,US);
B26D7/2621 (EP,US);
B26D2007/0087 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7507 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7513 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7763 (EP,US);
Y10T83/849 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8749 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1996/02] | Title | German: | Stützplatte für einen Rotationsschneider für Papier | [1996/02] | English: | A support panel for a rotary paper cutter | [1996/02] | French: | Plaque de support pour un dispositif de coupe pour papier | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/26] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB471222 (MODERN PRODUCTS L C L LTD, et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE4209778 (WALTER FITZE AG ZIMMEREI SCHRE [CH]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US1732564 (EMIL MAYER) [Y] 1-3 * figure - *; | [Y]WO8912532 (HOT ROLLER LAMINATING CO MELB [AU]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,7-10 *; | [Y]US3237497 (COOK LAWRENCE H) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, line 4 - line 6; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE585275 (PRAKTISCHE MASCHINEN G M B H) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 16 - line 95; figures 5-9 *; | [A]US3779119 (BROIDES I) [A] 6 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0062617 (STRAPAZZINI RESINE [IT]) [A] 6 * page 9, line 28 - line 33; figure 2 *; | [A]US1996224 (AUGUST WEDEKIND) | by applicant | US19930068399 |