EP0691253 - Folding cart [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tramac S.L. International Consulting & Trading, Avenida de Valencia, 27 03440 Ibi (Alicante) / ES | [1998/45] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states KST Kunststofftechnik GmbH Gewerbegebiet "Am Weiher" D-56377 Seelbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fürbeth, Alfred Hallgarten 28 D-56132 Dausenau / DE | 02 /
Berbegal Nauarro, Antonio Plaza Reies Magos 3 E-03440 Ibi (Alicante) / ES | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250159.1 | 03.07.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | DE19940011916U | 07.07.1994 Original published format: DE 9411916 U | [1996/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691253 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/12 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B62B1/12 (EP);
B62B2202/24 (EP);
B62B2205/00 (EP);
B62B2205/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/02] | Title | German: | Klappkarre | [1996/02] | English: | Folding cart | [1996/02] | French: | Chariot pliable | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/29] | 06.03.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1088358 (MANSS FA AUGUST) [X] 1-3,5-9,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2221429 (SMITH DAVID, et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]GB622545 (OLGA JEANNE JULIETTE ISABELLE, et al); | [A]EP0087200 (MAXILIN BV [NL]) | by applicant | EP0399364 | EP0009763 | WO9305993 |