EP0670529 - Imaging apparatus and photosensor apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/36] | Imaging apparatus and photosensor | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yasushige c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Toru c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Sawatari, Norio c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 04 /
Sakamoto, Katsura c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 05 /
Takei, Fumio c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 06 /
Watanuki, Tsuneo c/o Fujitsu limited, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300016.3 | 03.01.1995 | [1995/36] | Priority number, date | JP19940032474 | 02.03.1994 Original published format: JP 3247494 | [1995/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670529 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670529 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/02, G03G15/34 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G03G5/0514 (EP,US);
G03G13/025 (EP,US);
G03G15/344 (EP,US);
G03G5/0517 (EP,US);
G03G5/14708 (EP,US);
G03G2215/021 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0497 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/36] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät und Photosensorgerät | [1998/37] | English: | Imaging apparatus and photosensor apparatus | [1998/37] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images et appareil à détecteur photosensible | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/36] | Bilderzeugungsgerät und Photosensor | ||
Former [1995/36] | Imaging apparatus and photosensor | ||
Former [1995/36] | Appareil de formation d'images et détecteur photosensible | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0488151 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US4545669 (HAYS DAN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]EP0474220 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5159389 (MINAMI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0120167 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |