EP0662362 - Tundish slag stopper with sealing rim [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNECO/METREL, INC. 223 Interstate Road Addison Illinois 60101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MAGNECO/METREL, INC. 223 Interstate Road Addison, Illinois 60101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Connors, Charles W., Sr. 1121 Ashland Avenue Wilmette, Illinois 60091 / US | 02 /
Soofi, Madjid 1716 Essex Court St. Charles, Illinois 60174 / US | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al 27, Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300156.7 | 11.01.1995 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | US19940179930 | 11.01.1994 Original published format: US 179930 | US19940197510 | 16.02.1994 Original published format: US 197510 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662362 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D43/00 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
B22D43/004 (EP);
B22D41/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Verschluss der Schlacke in einem Giessgefäss, mit einem Dichtungsrand | [1995/28] | English: | Tundish slag stopper with sealing rim | [1995/28] | French: | Obturateur du laitier pour un panier de coulée, avec un joint d'étanchéité | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2367568 (DAUSSAN & CO) [A] 1,10-12,21,22 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2224230 (THERMO IND GMBH ET CO KG) [A] 1,10-12,21,22 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO8804209 (ARVA AG); | [A]DE3327671 (MANNESMANN AG) |