EP0664608 - Class AB push-pull drive circuit, drive method therefor and class AB electronic circuit using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN RADIO CO., LTD 1-1, Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states JAPAN RADIO CO., LTD 1-1, Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Kazuo, c/o Japan Radio Co., Ltd. 1-1 Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Adachi, Nobuyuki, c/o Japan Radio Co., Ltd. 1-1 Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nishibe, Masatoya, c/o Japan Radio Co., Ltd. 1-1 Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Egawa, Masahiko, c/o Japan Radio Co., Ltd. 1-1 Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Inoue, Akiharu, c/o Japan Radio Co., Ltd. 1-1 Shimorenjaku 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300230.0 | 13.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | JP19940004181 | 19.01.1994 Original published format: JP 418194 | JP19940144539 | 27.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14453994 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664608 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
H03F3/45479 (EP,US);
H03F3/26 (KR);
H03F3/45071 (EP,US);
H03F3/45076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Klasse AB-Genentakttreiberschaltung, Ansteuerverfahren dafür und Klasse AB-elektronische Schaltung mit einer solchen Treiberschaltung | [1995/30] | English: | Class AB push-pull drive circuit, drive method therefor and class AB electronic circuit using the same | [1995/30] | French: | Circuit de commande push-pull classe AB, méthode de commande pour ce circuit et circuit électronique classe AB l'utilisant | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/02] | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/02] | Request for further processing for: | 07.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4038607 (SCHADE JR OTTO HEINRICH) [A] 7-10,14,15 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 55; figure 2 *; | [X]US4757273 (BRAY DEREK [US]) [X] 1-6,8-13,16-20 * column 5, line 4 - column 9, line 50; figures 4,10-13,22-24 *; | [A] - R.H. ZELE ET AL, "FULLY-DIFFERENTIAL CMOS CURRENT-MODE CIRCUITS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 1991 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, SAN-DIEGO CA, (19910512), pages 24.1.1 - 24.1.4, XP000295792 [A] 7,20 * page 24.1.2 - page 24.1.3; figures 3,5 * |