EP0667640 - Multilayer laminate product and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brush Wellman Inc. 17876 St.Clair Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states BRUSH WELLMAN Inc. 17876 St.Clair Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mennucci, Joseph P. 20 Joyce Ann Drive Manville, Rhode Island 02838 / US | 02 /
Mead, Charles R. 8 Hanover Street Newbury, Massachusetts, VI 351 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Hogg, Jeffery Keith Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [1995/33] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300251.6 | 16.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940182288 | 14.01.1994 Original published format: US 182288 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667640 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667640 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373, B32B15/01 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/4882 (EP,US);
C04B37/021 (EP,US);
H01L21/4839 (EP,US);
H01L23/3672 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
C04B2237/34 (EP,US);
C04B2237/402 (EP,US);
C04B2237/404 (EP,US);
C04B2237/405 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/52 (EP,US);
C04B2237/706 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/33] | H01L23/373 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Mehrlagen-Laminatprodukt und seine Herstellung | [1995/33] | English: | Multilayer laminate product and process | [1995/33] | French: | Produit à multicouches laminé et procédé de fabrication associé | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/44] | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5020586 (MANSINGH VIVEK [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-22 *; | [A]EP0485205 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-17 *; | [A]US5125451 (MATTHEWS JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-21 * |