EP0664218 - Ink jet printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRIS GRAPHICS, INC. Six Crosby Drive Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states IRIS GRAPHICS, INC. Six Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barrett, Douglas John 56 Chamberlain Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
Burnett, Scott 42 Redfield Circle Derry, NH 03038 / US | 03 /
Gomez, Carlos Alberto 8 Robert Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
Jones, Alan Harper 1 Lehigh Street Arlington, MA 02174 / US | 05 /
O'Connell, Edward J. 22 Tow Path Drive Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300380.3 | 23.01.1995 | [1995/30] | Priority number, date | US19940185508 | 24.01.1994 Original published format: US 185508 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0664218 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0664218 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664218 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/20, B41J2/185, B41J2/175, B41J2/09 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
B41J11/70 (EP,US);
B41J13/223 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/20 (EP,US);
B41J2002/17516 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/30] | B41J2/20, B41J2/185 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/30] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker | [1995/30] | English: | Ink jet printing apparatus | [1995/30] | French: | Appareil d'impression par jet d'encre | [1995/30] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.09.2001 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5172238 (KUBOKI KEIJU [JP]) [X] 1,3,23 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 2; figures 2,3 * [A] 2 |