EP0666373 - Asphalt fume reduction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLAW-KNOX CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 750 Broadway Avenue East Mattoon Illinois 61938-4600 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states BLAW-KNOX CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 750 Broadway Avenue East Mattoon, Illinois 61938-4600 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonelli, Michael T. 320 North 35th Street Matoon, Illinois 61938 / US | 02 /
Padgett, John D. Rural Route Nr. 2, Box 114 Charleston, Illinois 61920 / US | 03 /
Bowhall, Garry 2702 Wedgewood Drive Champaign, Illinois 61921 / US | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300500.6 | 26.01.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | US19940192129 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: US 192129 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666373 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666373 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/48 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
E01C19/48 (EP,US);
E01C2301/30 (EP,US);
E01C2301/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/32] | Title | German: | Asphaltrauch Reduziersystem | [1995/32] | English: | Asphalt fume reduction system | [1995/32] | French: | Système de réduction de fumées d'asphalte | [1995/32] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4012160 (PARKER JIMMY L) [X] 1-4,10-14 * column 10, line 27 - column 12, line 57; figures 14-18 * [A] 15 [Y] 5,6,17,18; | [Y]GB2199874 (BERRY MICHAEL GEORGE) [Y] 5,6,17,18 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 14; figure 1 *; | [X]US3768981 (ALLIGER H) [X] 1,8,9 * column W * |