EP0667533 - Loss-of-signal detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lai, Benny W. 2085 Flintfield Drive San Jose, CA 95148 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300584.0 | 31.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940195243 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 195243 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667533 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667533 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G01R19/1659 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/33] | Title | German: | Signalverlustdetektor | [1995/33] | English: | Loss-of-signal detector | [1995/33] | French: | Détecteur de perte de signal | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 13.01.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0190471 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0231959 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1* figure 8; claim 1 * |