EP0667150 - Venlafaxine and its analogues for inducing cognition enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Venlamafaxine and its analogues for inducing cognition enhancement | ||
[2002/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | ||
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Husbands, George Edward Morris 258 Dayleview Road Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 02 /
Abou-Gharbia, Magid Abdel-Megid 6 James Hayward Road Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | 03 /
Moyer, John Allen 6274 Ingham Road New Hope, Pennsylvania 18938 / US | 04 /
Muth, Eric Anthony 10 Sugan Close New Hope, Pennsylvania 18938 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al C/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Connelly, Michael John, et al c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300612.9 | 31.01.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940195417 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 195417 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667150 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667150 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/275, A61P25/28 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/33] | A61K31/135, A61K31/275 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Venlafaxin und seine Analoga zum Herbeiführen einer Verbesserung der kognitiven Funktionen | [1995/33] | English: | Venlafaxine and its analogues for inducing cognition enhancement | [2002/08] | French: | Venlafaxine et ses analogues pour induire une amélioration des fonctions cognitives | [1995/33] |
Former [1995/33] | Venlamafaxine and its analogues for inducing cognition enhancement | Examination procedure | 01.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02014620.5 / EP1245228 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4535186 (HUSBANDS G E MORRIS [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * column W *; | [PX]CA2126305 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US])[PX] 1-9; | [E]EP0639374 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - Saletu B et al, "Pharmacodynamics of venlafaxine evaluated by EEG brain mapping, psychometry and psychophysiology.", BR J CLIN PHARMACOL (ENGLAND), JUN 1992, VOL. 33, NO. 6, PAGE(S) 589-601, [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [PX] - Cunningham LA et al, "A comparison of venlafaxine, trazodone, and placebo in major depression.", J CLIN PSYCHOPHARMACOL (UNITED STATES), APR 1994, VOL. 14, NO. 2, PAGE(S) 99-106, [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * |