EP0666546 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/32] | Image processing apparatus and method | ||
[1999/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanno, Akiko, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Akio, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Umeda, Yoshinobu, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300654.1 | 02.02.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | JP19940012742 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1274294 | JP19940062964 | 31.03.1994 Original published format: JP 6296494 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666546 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666546 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, G06T11/60 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/32] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | [1999/39] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [1999/39] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images | [1999/39] |
Former [1995/32] | Bildverarbeitungsgerät und -verfahren | ||
Former [1995/32] | Image processing apparatus and method | ||
Former [1995/32] | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images | Examination procedure | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5138443 (IKEDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 50 - line 60 * * column 11, line 58 - column 12, line 14 * * column 26, line 28 - line 39 * * column 29, line 48 - column 30, line 13 * * column 48, line 17 - line 32 * * column 50, line 20 - column 51, line 37 * * Figures 25G, 29A-29D, 46A-46D, 60A-60C, 61A-61F, 76A, 76A. *; | [A]EP0344976 (CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,6,10-12,14 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0321173 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910411), vol. 15, no. 143, Database accession no. (E - 1054), & JP03021173 A 19910102 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - TRIBUTE A, "UNDA: First of a New Generation of Color Systems.", SEYBOLD REPORT ON PUBLISHING SYSTEMS, USA, (19891009), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 1 - 24 [A] 1-21 * Page 10, paragraph "Page assembly" * |