EP0667571 - Method of steering of instructions in a computer system and computer system for implementing said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Steering of instructions in a computer system | ||
[1999/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noordeen, Nazeemudeen 3655 Pruneridge Ave Apt. 3 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 02 /
Zheng, Jason 3086 Orthello Way Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300682.2 | 03.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940194899 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 194899 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667571 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667571 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667571 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G06F9/382 (EP,US);
G06F9/3802 (EP,US);
G06F9/3853 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lenkung von Instruktionen in einem Rechnersystem und Rechnersystem zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1999/30] | English: | Method of steering of instructions in a computer system and computer system for implementing said method | [1999/30] | French: | Méthode de guidage des instructions dans un système d'ordinateur et système d'ordinateur permettant de l'utiliser | [1999/30] |
Former [1995/33] | Lenkung von Instruktionen in einem Rechnersystem | ||
Former [1995/33] | Steering of instructions in a computer system | ||
Former [1995/33] | Guidage des instructions dans un système d'ordinateur | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0449661 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * column A; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [XY]EP0455966 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,3 * [Y] 7; | [XY]EP0459232 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * column A * [Y] 7; | [PXY]US5337415 (DELANO ERIC R [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,6,10 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7; | [XY] - MINAGAWA K. ET AL., "Pre-decoding mechanism for superscalar architecture", IEEE PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMPUTERS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, VICTORIA, CANADA, (19910509), vol. 1, pages 21 - 24, XP000280266 [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * the whole document * [Y] 7 | [XY] - VASSILIADIS ET AL., "On the attributes of the SCISM Organization", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE NEWS, NEW YORK, US, vol. 20, no. 4, pages 44 - 53, XP000298584 [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * the whole document * [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/142880.142894 | [A] - L.C.HIGBIE, "Overlapped operation with microprogramming", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, vol. C-27, no. 3, pages 270 - 275, XP000211909 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |