EP0677413 - Apparatus for interconnecting wheelchair batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVACARE CORPORATION 899 Cleveland Street Elyria Ohio 44036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states INVACARE CORPORATION 899 Cleveland Street Elyria, Ohio 44036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goertzen, Gerold G. 205 Marks Road Brunswick, Ohio 44212 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1998/23] |
Former [1995/42] | Cook, Anthony John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301058.4 | 20.02.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940228118 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: US 228118 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677413 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677413 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04, H01M2/10, H01M2/20, A61G5/04, H01R13/28 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
A61G5/045 (EP,US);
H01M50/202 (EP,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,US);
H01M50/298 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verbindung von Batterien eines Rollstuhls | [1995/42] | English: | Apparatus for interconnecting wheelchair batteries | [1995/42] | French: | Appareil pour l'interconnection des batteries d'un fauteuil roulant | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3437164 (RABJOHN RODNEY R) [A] 1,6,12 * column 3, line 74 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-3; claims 1,4,5,7 *; | [A]US3749192 (KARCHAK A, et al) [A] 1,6,12 * figure 2; claim 4 *; | [Y]DE2558456 (HOPPECKE ZOELLNER SOHN ACCU) [Y] 1-4,6-8,11,12,14,18-20 * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]GB2183081 (BRADLEY JOHN MALCOLM) [Y] 10,15-18 * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US4967864 (BOYER RONALD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * figures 2,11; claims 1,14,20 *; | [A]WO9204200 (FORTRESS LITE STYLE INC [US]) [A] 1,5-8,11-14,18-20 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 9 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 13; figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]US5181855 (MOSQUERA RENE A [US], et al) [Y] 5,9,13 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5234066 (AHSING TERRY P [US], et al) [A] 1,6,12* figure 5 * |