Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5702807 | 30.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US73431596 | 21.10.1996 | US39934895 | 03.03.1995 | JP3365294 | 03.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07245482 | Global Dossier | 19.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP3365294 | 03.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0670598 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2001 | B1 | EP0670598 | 10.04.1996 | A3 | EP0670598 | 06.09.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP3365294 | 03.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69522484T | 25.04.2002 | T2 | DE69522484D1 | 11.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP3365294 | 03.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0178076B | 15.05.1999 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP3365294 | 03.03.1994 |