EP0671335 - Stackable/nestable containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McKechnie UK Limited Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states McKechnie UK Limited Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall, West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cope, Andrew Christopher 3 Sheldon Avenue, Wednesbury West Midlands, WS10 9DU / GB | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Skinner, Michael Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Skinner, Michael Paul Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [1995/37] | Skinner, Michael Paul c/o Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301437.0 | 06.03.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | GB19940004833 | 12.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9404833 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0671335 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0671335 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671335 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/04, B65D21/028, B65D21/02, B65D21/06 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
B65D21/0235 (EP,US);
B65D21/062 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/37] | B65D21/04, B65D21/028 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/38] |
Former [1995/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stapelbare und ineinandersetzbare Behälter | [1995/37] | English: | Stackable/nestable containers | [1995/37] | French: | Conteneurs empilables et emboîtables | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.1999 | BE | 07.07.1999 | CH | 07.07.1999 | GR | 07.07.1999 | IT | 07.07.1999 | LI | 07.07.1999 | NL | 07.07.1999 | DK | 07.10.1999 | LU | 06.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
GR | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
DK | 07.10.1999 | ||
LU | 06.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
GR | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
DK | 07.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
DK | 07.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 12.10.1999 | ||
LI | 12.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4105117 (ATKIN HOWARD DAWSON, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,15-18,21,22 * column 9, line 37 - line 52; figure 3 *; | [X]GB2136399 (ADDIS LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,22 * the whole document *; | [A]CH668404 (HESSMERT KG GUSTAV) [A] 1-3,5,6,22 * page 3, column L, line 55 - line 64; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2617803 (VERCHERE M [FR]) [A] 1-3,5-8,10,22* page 6, line 30 - line 36; figure 7 *; | [X]EP0579158 (FESQUET JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,15,19,20,22 * column 8, line 8 - line 34; figure 6 *; | [AP]GB2275254 (MAILBOX INT LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-3,5,6,15-22 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |