EP0674419 - Communication system for processing caller ID information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Aileen Y. 159-00 Riverside Drive West, Apt. 7H-70 New York, New York 10032 / US | 02 /
Fallon, Joseph Michael 5 Homer Road South Amboy, New Jersey 07733 / US | 03 /
Wallach, Ryan S. 63-C Phelps Avenue New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301756.3 | 16.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | US19940215994 | 22.03.1994 Original published format: US 215994 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0674419 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M3/54, H04Q3/72 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M3/546 (EP,US);
H04M9/005 (EP,US);
H04Q3/72 (EP,US);
H04M2201/14 (EP,US);
H04M2242/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/02 (EP,US);
H04M3/42042 (EP,US);
H04M3/42059 (EP,US);
H04M9/00 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1309 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13091 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13213 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1995/39] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem zur Verarbeitung von Anruferidentifizierungsinformationen | [1995/39] | English: | Communication system for processing caller ID information | [1995/39] | French: | Système de communication pour traiter des informations d'identification d'appel | [1995/39] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |