EP0673759 - Highly oriented multilayer film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A Duncan, S.C. 29334-0464 / US | ||
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bekele, Solomon 4 Walden Way, Taylors South Carolina 29687 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/39] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301908.0 | 22.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | US19940216201 | 22.03.1994 Original published format: US 216201 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0673759 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0673759 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673759 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B65D65/40 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B2250/05 (US);
B32B2307/514 (US);
B32B2307/718 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2309/105 (US);
B32B2323/043 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
Y10T428/1383 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | Hochorientierter Mehrschichtfilm | [1995/39] | English: | Highly oriented multilayer film | [1995/39] | French: | Feuille multicouche à orientation élevée | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2001 | BE | 20.06.2001 | CH | 20.06.2001 | LI | 20.06.2001 | NL | 20.06.2001 | DK | 20.09.2001 | PT | 20.09.2001 | SE | 20.09.2001 | GR | 21.09.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 20.06.2001 | |
BE | 20.06.2001 | ||
CH | 20.06.2001 | ||
LI | 20.06.2001 | ||
NL | 20.06.2001 | ||
DK | 20.09.2001 | ||
PT | 20.09.2001 | ||
SE | 20.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 20.06.2001 | |
BE | 20.06.2001 | ||
CH | 20.06.2001 | ||
LI | 20.06.2001 | ||
NL | 20.06.2001 | ||
PT | 20.09.2001 | ||
SE | 20.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 20.06.2001 | |
BE | 20.06.2001 | ||
CH | 20.06.2001 | ||
LI | 20.06.2001 | ||
PT | 20.09.2001 | ||
SE | 20.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 20.06.2001 | |
BE | 20.06.2001 | ||
CH | 20.06.2001 | ||
LI | 20.06.2001 | ||
SE | 20.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 20.06.2001 | |
SE | 20.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 20.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0236099 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 4 * * page 10, line 17 - line 26 * * page 13, line 10 - page 17, line 18 * * page 23, line 12 - line 16 * * examples 1,7 *; | [X]EP0311293 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-26* the whole document *; | [X]EP0465931 (GUNZE KK [JP]) [X] 1-26 * claims 1,4 * * example - *; | [X]EP0560495 (OKURA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-26 * column W * |