EP0677495 - Nonhazardous pumpable refractory insulating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNECO/METREL, INC. 223 Interstate Road Addison Illinois 60101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states MAGNECO/METREL, INC. 223 Interstate Road Addison, Illinois 60101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Subrata 1879 Jahns Drive Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Michael W. 232 Lakeshore Lane Bloomingdale, Illinois 60108 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302168.0 | 31.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940228446 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: US 228446 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677495 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677495 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677495 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/101, C04B35/18, C04B35/63, C04B35/80, C04B38/00, B28B1/14 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
C04B35/18 (EP,US);
C04B35/6316 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | Ungiftige, pumpbare, feuerfeste und isolierende Masse | [1995/42] | English: | Nonhazardous pumpable refractory insulating composition | [1995/42] | French: | Composition non-toxique, pompable, réfractaire et isolante | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3353975 (SHANNON RICHARD F, et al) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4061501 (IVARSSON PAUL LENNART, et al) [A] 1-34 * claim - *; | [A]DE2632084 (JAKLIN HANS, et al) [A] 1-34 * claim - *; | [A]US4218254 (CLAVAUD BERNARD A [FR], et al) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4342597 (BROWN WILLIAM F) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4751204 (KYODEN HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0364640 (CHICAGO FIRE BRICK CO [US]) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4921536 (RECHTER HAROLD L [US]) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US5147830 (BANERJEE SUBRATA [US], et al) [DA] 1-34* the whole document *; | [A]EP0505141 (MAGNECO METREL INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [A]US5151253 (MERRY RICHARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 31 * * example -; claim - * |