Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4100721B | Global Dossier | 11.06.2008 | B2 | JPH0844394 | 16.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0676744 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2000 | B1 | EP0676744 | 11.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2144823 | 17.01.2006 | C | CA2144823 | 05.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1113333C | 02.07.2003 | C | CN1118914 | 20.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69518454T | 12.04.2001 | T2 | DE69518454D1 | 28.09.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0676744T | 18.12.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100367202B | 04.03.2003 | B1 | KR950034055 | 26.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO308635B | 02.10.2000 | B1 | NO951287L | 05.10.1995 | L | NO951287D0 | 03.04.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5715365 | 03.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US22211994 | 04.04.1994 |