EP0676744 - Estimation of excitation parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL VOICE SYSTEMS, INC. One Van de Graaff Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [1995/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, Daniel Wayne 86 West Hollis Road Hollis, New Hampshire 03049 / US | 02 /
Lim, Jae S. 21 West Chardon Road Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302290.2 | 04.04.1995 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | US19940222119 | 04.04.1994 Original published format: US 222119 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676744 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676744 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/08 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
G10L25/93 (EP,US);
G10L13/00 (KR);
G10L19/087 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (EP,US);
G10L25/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/41] | G10L9/14, G10L9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, SE [1995/41] | Title | German: | Abschätzung von Anregungsparametern | [1995/41] | English: | Estimation of excitation parameters | [1995/41] | French: | Evaluation des paramètres d'excitation | [1995/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0076234 (GRETAG AG [CH]) [X] 1,25,26,27,28; | [A]EP0124411 (ZURCHER JEAN FREDERIC) [A] 1,25,26,27,28; | [A]EP0154381 (PHILIPS NV [NL])[A] 1,25,26,27,28 | Examination | US4091237 |