Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3487568B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2004 | B2 | JPH0817074 | 19.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP11012094 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011894 | 27.04.1994 | JP12567195 | 27.04.1995 | JP11011994 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0680039 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2000 | B1 | EP0680039 | 02.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP11012094 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011894 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011994 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69518786T | 15.03.2001 | T2 | DE69518786D1 | 19.10.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP11012094 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011894 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011994 | 27.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5776575 | 07.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP11012094 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011894 | 27.04.1994 | JP11011994 | 27.04.1994 |