EP0680039 - Information recording medium and process for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraoka, Mizuho, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Imataki, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302349.6 | 10.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | JP19940110120 | 27.04.1994 Original published format: JP 11012094 | JP19940110119 | 27.04.1994 Original published format: JP 11011994 | JP19940110118 | 27.04.1994 Original published format: JP 11011894 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680039 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680039 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26, G11B7/00 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
G11B7/2542 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/252 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G11B7/247 (EP,US);
G11B7/2472 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/44] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1995/44] | English: | Information recording medium and process for production thereof | [1995/44] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement d'information et procédé pour produire celui-ci | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.09.2000 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [X] 1,19 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [A] 1,19 |