EP0737617 - Watertight pit cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dabico, Inc. 2995 Airway Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states Dabico, Inc. 2995 Airway Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Devlin, Michael 1565 Harriet Lane Anaheim, California 92802 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302408.0 | 11.04.1995 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737617 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737617 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/36, E02D29/14 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
E02D29/149 (EP,US);
E02D29/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1996/42] | Title | German: | Wasserdichter Grubendeckel | [1996/42] | English: | Watertight pit cover | [1996/42] | French: | Couvercle étanche pour fosse | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 21.04.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4469467 (ODILL FRANK J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - line 52 * * column 3, line 5 - line 14 *; | [A]US4592674 (BALIVA MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 14; figure 6 *; | [A]DE9013875U (MANFRED FLADUNG GMBH) [A] 1,5,6,11 * figures 3,1 *; | [A]US5056678 (GRILLS LAURENCE M [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 3,4 * |