EP0678354 - Steel material shearing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OHYODO DIESEL CO., Ltd. 8-2, Ohyodonaka 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states OHYODO DIESEL CO., Ltd. 8-2, Ohyodonaka 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morikawa, Sumio 208-3, Kitanoda Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Kondoh, Masahiro 3-10-2, Kobayashihigashi, Taisho-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Tillbrook, Christopher John The Intellectual Property Shop Ltd. The Old Village Hall School Street Churchover Rugby Warwickshire CV23 0EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Tillbrook, Christopher John Chris J Tillbrook & Co 5 Old Rectory Close Churchover Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 0EN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302472.6 | 12.04.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | JP19940078289 | 18.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7828994 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678354 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678354 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23D17/00, B23D17/06 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
B23D17/06 (EP,US);
B23D17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/43] | Title | German: | Stahlschneidevorrichtung | [1995/43] | English: | Steel material shearing machine | [1995/43] | French: | Dispositif pour couper des matériaux en acier | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0529380 (KRUPP MASCHINENTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 5, line 41 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [PY]EP0629460 (OYODO DIESEL KK [JP]) [PY] 1,2 * figures 1-9; claims 1-3 * |