EP0677971 - Reproduction circuit for skin color in video signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeshima, Masahiro Pittoin Inaba 102, 1-4, Inaba-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka, 567 / JP | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302473.4 | 12.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | JP19940077090 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7709094 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677971 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677971 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677971 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/68 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
H04N5/20 (EP,US);
H04N9/643 (KR);
H04N9/68 (US);
H04N9/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/42] | Title | German: | Hautfarbewiedergabeschaltung für Videosignalen | [1995/42] | English: | Reproduction circuit for skin color in video signals | [1995/42] | French: | Circuit de reproduction pour la couleur de peau dans des signaux vidéo | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5269289 (TAKEHANA SAKAE [JP], et al) |