EP0678685 - Overrunning wrap spring clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [1995/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehman, Richard J. 543B Country Club Parkway Mt. Laurel, New Jersey 08054 / US | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1995/43] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302481.7 | 13.04.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | US19940229531 | 19.04.1994 Original published format: US 229531 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678685 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/20 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
F16D41/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Freilaufkupplung mit Umschlingungsfeder | [1995/43] | English: | Overrunning wrap spring clutch | [1995/43] | French: | Embrayage à roue libre avec ressort à enroulement | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 10.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3125889 (PERRYMAN) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column W * [Y] 8-10; | [Y]US5064038 (BATCHELDER J WILLIAM) [Y] 8-10 * column 3, line 51 - line 66 *; | [XY]US3893554 (WASON THOMAS D) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, line 38 - line 56; figures 3-5 * [Y] 4; | [YA]US3926286 (JOHNSON LEE W) [Y] 4 * column W * [A] 1,3,5-10; | [XA]EP0517185 (TESMA INT INC ;ONTARIO INC 730143 (CA); ONTARIO INC 730144 (CA)) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column W * [A] 8-10; | [A]US3618721 (HARE RICHARD C) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]FR2397562 (SULZER AG) [A] 8 * page 11, line 30 - line 35 * |