EP0685951 - Line interface devices for fast-packet networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thor, Allen 223 Beufort Avenue Livingston, New Jersey / US | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302814.9 | 26.04.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | US19940236853 | 02.05.1994 Original published format: US 236853 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685951 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685951 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685951 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP);
H04L69/324 (KR);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (EP);
H04L49/3081 (KR);
H04L49/901 (KR);
H04L7/027 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/49] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Leitungsschnittstelle für ein schnelles Paketvermittlungsnetzwerk | [1995/49] | English: | Line interface devices for fast-packet networks | [1995/49] | French: | Interface de ligne pour réseau de paquets rapide | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2001 | BE | 04.07.2001 | IT | 04.07.2001 | NL | 04.07.2001 | DK | 04.10.2001 | PT | 04.10.2001 | SE | 04.10.2001 | GR | 05.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
BE | 04.07.2001 | ||
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
DK | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
GR | 05.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
BE | 04.07.2001 | ||
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
DK | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
BE | 04.07.2001 | ||
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
DK | 04.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
BE | 04.07.2001 | ||
NL | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
BE | 04.07.2001 | ||
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
PT | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 04.07.2001 | |
SE | 04.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 04.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5237569 (SEKIHATA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 25 *; | [X]EP0560706 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4,18,19 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 58 * * figure 5; claim 8 *; | [A] - CCITT, RED BOOK, VOLUME 8, RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE V SERIES, 8-19 OCTOBER 1984, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, XP002052952 [A] 1-4,18,19 * PAGES 239-245, RECOMMENDATION V.35 * * page 241, paragraph 10 * * "ESPECIALLY TABLE 1/V.35" * | by applicant | EP0560706 | EP0669778 | EP0676879 |