EP0679407 - Vapor sterilization using a non-aqueous source of hydrogen peroxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL, INC. 2500 Arbrook Boulevard Arlington Texas 76004-3030 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL, INC. 2500 Arbrook Boulevard Arlington, Texas 76004-3030 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Szu-Min 3110 Shadow Drive West Arlington, TX 76006 / US | 02 /
Swanzy, James Archie 2807 Wildplum Drive Arlington, TX 76015 / US | 03 /
Jacobs, Paul Taylor 2815 Oak Trail Court Arlington, TX 76016 / US | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302847.9 | 27.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | US19940234738 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: US 234738 | US19950369786 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: US 369786 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0679407 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0679407 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, C01B15/037, A01N59/00, C01B15/01 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
A61L2/208 (EP,US);
A61L9/00 (KR);
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/14 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
C01B15/01 (EP,US);
C01B15/037 (EP,US);
C01B15/06 (EP,US);
C01B15/08 (EP,US);
C01B15/103 (EP,US);
C01B15/14 (EP,US);
C01B15/16 (EP,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US);
Y10S525/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N25/18, A01N25/08 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/44] | A61L2/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/44] | Title | German: | Dampfsterilisation unter Verwendung eines nichtwässriger Wasserstoffperoxidquelle | [1995/44] | English: | Vapor sterilization using a non-aqueous source of hydrogen peroxide | [1995/44] | French: | Stérilisation par la vapeur utilisant une source non aqueuse de peroxyde d'hydrogène | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/48] | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP00204462.6 / EP1084713 | EP04078547.9 / EP1557181 | Request for further processing for: | 14.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04343850 ; | [A]US4169123 (MOORE FRANCIS C, et al); | [A]EP0278623 (SURGIKOS INC [US]) [A] 10-13 * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 5 *; | [AX]US5008093 (MERIANOS JOHN J [US]) [A] 23,24 * claims 1-5 * [X] 25; | [AX]US5008106 (MERIANOS JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 23,24 * column 1, line 24 - line 58 * [X] 25; | [AX]US5077047 (BISS RUSSELL B [US], et al) [A] 23,24 * column 1, line 46 - line 62 * [X] 25; | [YXA]US5108742 (MERIANOS JOHN J [US]) [Y] 1,3,9 * column 1, line 15 - line 27 * * column 2, line 10 - line 17 * [X] 25 [A] 24; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930416), vol. 017, no. 195, Database accession no. (C - 1049), & JP04343850 A 19921130 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1,3,9 * abstract * | [X] - BAKULINA, V. M. ET AL, "X-ray diffraction study of rubidium carbonate peroxyhydrates Rb2CO3. 3H2O2 and Rb2CO3.6H2O2", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19720904), vol. 77, no. 10, Database accession no. 67332, XP002087404 [X] 26 * abstract * | [ ] - IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, SER. KHIM. (1972), (4), 748-50 CODEN: IASKA6 |