EP0684543 - Moving an image within a display viewing area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Derek K.W. 18 Bridewell Crescent Richmond Hill, Ontario / CA | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303317.2 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | CA19942124028 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: CA 2124028 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684543 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/48] | Title | German: | Verschieben eines Bildes innerhalb einer angezeigten Sichtzone | [1995/48] | English: | Moving an image within a display viewing area | [1995/48] | French: | Déplacement d'une image dans une zone de visualisation affichée | [1995/48] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/10] | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0249293 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9 * column A * * column 5, line 23 - line 38 ** column 9, line 17 - line 36; figure 5 *; | [XAY]EP0493990 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - line 36 * * column 9, line 34 - column 10, line 11; figures 2A-2C 4A-4C * [A] 2,3 [Y] 12; | [A]FR2680899 (ALCATEL CABLE [FR]) [A] 1-3,7-9 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0533424 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * column A * * page 3, line 25 - line 30; figures 2,4 * * page 3, line 41 - line 44 * | [XY] - "Scroll Control Box", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, vol. 36, no. 4, pages 399 - 403 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12 | by applicant | US5196838 |