Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0694349
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.10.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
01.07.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
02.03.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
07.07.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
10.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.04.1997 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
04.01.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] |