EP0685619 - Position setting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABA (UK) LIMITED P O Box 2 Tiverton Devon EX16 6YT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states KABA (UK) LIMITED P O Box 2 Tiverton, Devon EX16 6YT / GB | ||
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states KABA LOCKS LIMITED P O Box 2 Tiverton, Devon EX16 6YT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, John 6, Vicarage Lawns Creech St. Michael Taunton Somerset TA1 3HH / GB | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 95303714.0 | 31.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | GB19940010845 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410845 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685619 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685619 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/04 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
E05B17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Positionierungsvorrichtung | [1995/49] | English: | Position setting device | [1995/49] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/35] | 02.04.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4122414 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0224104 (NEIMAN SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9111579 (MORICZ FERENC [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2644000 (SPRECHER & SCHUH AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0561662 (ANTIVOLS SIMPLEX SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |