blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0686959

EP0686959 - Power driving circuit of a thin film transistor liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-3 Dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-3 Dong, Paldal-ku
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR
Former [1995/52]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-Dong, Paldal-Ku
Suwon-Si, Kyungki-Do / KR
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS Co. Ltd.
416 Maetong-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Shin, Kyoung-Hoon
No 411, Dongshin Apt. 202-dong, Jongja-dong
Jangan-gu, Suwon-si, Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Moon, Seung-Hwan
No 505, Hanshin-Royal Apt. 1-dong
63-34 Jamwon-dong, Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date95303810.605.06.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateKR1994001272307.06.1994         Original published format: KR 9412723
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686959
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686959
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1995
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/36
[1995/50]
CPC:
G09G3/3614 (KR); G09G3/3655 (EP,KR,US); G09G3/3696 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/02 (KR); G09G2330/021 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Leistungstreiberschaltung für eine Flüssigkristallanzeige mit Dünnfilmtransistoren[1995/50]
English:Power driving circuit of a thin film transistor liquid crystal display[1995/50]
French:Circuit de commande de puissance pour un dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides comprenant des transistors en couche mince[1995/50]
Examination procedure18.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/20]
06.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.1999Fee for grant paid
18.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2002/11]DE27.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0599622  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicant   - "An 8.4-in TFT-LCD system for a note size computer using 3-bit digital data drivers", Japan Display'92, pages 475 - 478
    - TOSHIBA AND HITACHI SEISAKUSHO ET AL., "5V driving method for low consumption power of TFT color liquid crystal", NIKKEL MICRODEVICES, (199308), pages 64 - 65
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.