blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0687133

EP0687133 - Hole-transporting material and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
No. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
No. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tamano, Michiko, c/o Toyo Ink Manufact. Co., Ltd.
3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Onikubo, Toshikazu, c/o Toyo Ink Manufac. Co., Ltd.
3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Enokida, Toshio, c/o Toyo Ink Manufac. Co., Ltd.
3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date95304023.509.06.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateJP1994012875210.06.1994         Original published format: JP 12875294
JP1994012875310.06.1994         Original published format: JP 12875394
JP1994012875410.06.1994         Original published format: JP 12875494
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0687133
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0687133
Date:05.06.1996
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0687133
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.1996
ClassificationIPC:H05B33/14, G03G5/06, C09B47/00, C07D487/22, // (C07D487/22, 259:00, 209:00, 209:00, 209:00, 209:00)
[1995/50]
CPC:
C07D487/22 (EP,US); C07F5/003 (EP,US); C07F5/069 (EP,US);
C07F7/025 (EP,US); C07F7/0836 (EP,US); C07F7/2204 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,US); C09B47/067 (EP,US); C09B47/08 (EP,US);
G03G5/0696 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Ladungslöchertransportmaterial[1995/50]
English:Hole-transporting material and its use[1995/50]
French:Matériau transportant des trous de charge[1995/50]
Examination procedure26.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
25.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:18.03.1999Request for further processing filed
18.03.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.04.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0044686  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * column W *;
 [A]EP0284370  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,9-11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0305938  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,9-11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0373643  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* column W *
by applicantUS3180730
 US3189447
 US3257203
 US3717462
 US3820989
 JPS5193224
 US4150978
 JPS5459143
 JPS55108667
 US4232103
 JPS55144250
 JPS56119132
 JPS58190953
 JPS59195658
    - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 51, page 913
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.