EP0686995 - An ion implantation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies, Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915 / US | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirokawa, Suguru 336 Anjyu Saijyou City, Ehme-pref. / JP | 02 /
Sinclair, Frank 14 Royal Street Quincy, Massachusetts 02170-2112 / US | 03 /
DeMario, Neil Evan 12 Second Street Ipswich, Massachusetts 01938-2128 / US | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304036.7 | 12.06.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | JP19940129319 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12931994 | US19950465420 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 465420 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686995 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686995 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/317, H01J37/304 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
H01J37/304 (EP);
H01J37/3171 (EP);
H01L21/68728 (EP);
H01L21/68764 (EP);
H01L21/68771 (EP);
H01J2237/202 (EP);
H01J2237/31703 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/50] | Title | German: | Ionenimplantierungsgerät | [1995/50] | English: | An ion implantation device | [1995/50] | French: | Appareil d'implantation inonique | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH05887746 ; | [XA]US4234797 (RYDING GEOFFREY) [X] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 13 * * column 2, line 58 - line 62 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 5 * * column 7, line 43 - line 55 * * figure 4 * [A] 2,3,6,9,13; | [A]WO9113457 (IBIS TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 5 * page 13, line 14 - line 18; figure 7 *; | [A]US3778626 (ROBERTSON G) [A] 2,6,9,12 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 20 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4628209 (WITTKOWER ANDREW [US]); | [DA]EP0458422 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830811), vol. 7, no. 182, Database accession no. (E - 192)<1327> , & JP5887746 A 19830525 (NIPPON DENKI) [X] 1 * figure . * [A] 3,6 | Examination | US5126576 | by applicant | JPS61116746 |