EP0689131 - A computer system for executing branch instructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS LTD. 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sturges, Andrew Craig 3 Wellington Avenue Montpelier, Bristol BS6 5HP / GB | 02 /
Sidwell, Nathan Mackenzie 21 Cleave Street St. Werburghs, Bristol BS2 9UD / GB | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304199.3 | 16.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | GB19940012487 | 22.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9412487 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689131 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689131 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/3804 (EP,US);
G06F9/3842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/52] | Title | German: | Computersystem zur Ausführung von Verzweigungsbefehlen | [2000/49] | English: | A computer system for executing branch instructions | [1995/52] | French: | Système d'ordinateur pour éxécuter des instructions de branchement | [2000/22] |
Former [1995/52] | Rechnersystem zur Ausführung von Verzweigungsbefehlen | ||
Former [1995/52] | Système calculateur d'éxécution des instructions de branchement | Examination procedure | 25.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 09.07.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00102080.9 / EP1003095 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.08.2001 | IT | 29.08.2001 | DE | 30.11.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 29.08.2001 | |
DE | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/21] | DE | 30.11.2001 | |
FR | 25.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | DE | 30.11.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0355069 (EVANS & SUTHERLAND COMPUTER CO [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6,9-11,13,14,17,19-21,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US3551895 (DRISCOLL GRAHAM C JR) [A] 1,12,15,17,22 * abstract; column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 10; column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 27; column 7, lines 2-6 *; | [A]US3577189 (COCKE JOHN, et al) [A] 1,10,11,13,17,20,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4200927 (HUGHES JEFFREY F [US], et al) [A] 4 * column W *; | [A] - CORTADELLA AND LLABERIA, "Making branches transparent to the execution unit", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MINI AND MICROCOMPUTERS, CALGARY, CALIFORNIA US, vol. 11, no. 1, pages 13 - 17, XP000210082 [A] 1,5,6,9-11,13,17,23 * the whole document * | [A] - PLESZKUN AND FARRENS, "An instruction cache design for use with a delayed branch", PROCEEDINGS 4TH MIT CONFERENCE : ADVANCED RESEARCH IN VLSI, CAMBRIDGE, MA,US, (19860407), pages 73 - 88, XP002155740 [A] 1,5-7,9,15,23,24 * page 74, 4th paragraph - page 75, 1st paragraph ; page 78, 4th paragraph - page 80, 1st paragraph ; page 85, 3rd paragraph ; * | [A] - BEEBE ET AL., "Instruction sequencing control", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, vol. 14, no. 12, pages 3599 - 3611 [A] 1,5,6,10,11,13,14,17,20-23 * page 3601, lines 31-40; page 3602, lines 21-33; page 3603, lines 3-7; page 3606, line 28 - page 3607, line 43 * | [A] - LEE,MAHON AND MORRIS, "Pathlength reduction features in the PA-Risc architecture", COMPCON SPRING 92, SAN FRANCISCO,US, (19920224), doi:doi:10.1109/CMPCON.1992.186698, pages 129 - 135, XP000340724 [A] 27,37 * page 133, section 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMPCON.1992.186698 | [A] - "Acceleration of multimedia applications using a branch conditional to previous target instruction", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, ARMONK,US, vol. 37, no. 4b, pages 285 - 288 [A] 27,37 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0355069 |