EP0695887 - Friction lining materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. Powertrain Technical Center, 3800 Automation Avenue, Suite 100 Auburn Hills MI 48326-1782 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. Powertrain Technical Center, 3800 Automation Avenue, Suite 100 Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1782 / US | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3800 Automation Avenue, Suite 100 Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-1782 / US | ||
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. 6700 18 1/2 Mile Road, P.O. Box 8022 Sterling Heights, Michigan 48311-8022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lam, Robert Chi-Chiu 120 E. George Street, No. 419 Bensenville, Il. 60106 / US | 02 /
Chen, Yih-Fang 6701 Innsbruck Court, Lisle Il. 60532 / US | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [1996/06] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304228.0 | 19.06.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | US19940284330 | 02.08.1994 Original published format: US 284330 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695887 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695887 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0695887 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02, C08J5/04 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
F16D69/02 (KR);
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0091 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2008 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2123 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2131 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2344 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/06] | Title | German: | Reibbelagmaterialien | [1996/06] | English: | Friction lining materials | [1996/06] | French: | Matériaux pour garniture de friction | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 04.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
10.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Verbandes der Reibbelagindustrie e.V Höhenberger Strasse 30 51103 Köln / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
10.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Verbandes der Reibbelagindustrie e.V Höhenberger Strasse 30 51103 Köln / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
10.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Verbandes der Reibbelagindustrie e.V Höhenberger Strasse 30 51103 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Dallmeyer, Georg Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
10.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE Verbandes der Reibbelagindustrie e.V Höhenberger Strasse 30 51103 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | 19.02.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.08.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.04.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.01.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.09.2002 | Appeal received No. T0934/02 | 20.11.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.04.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 12.09.2002 | Appeal received | 29.04.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0640774 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [YP] 1-4,7,9,10 * page 5, line 42 - page 6, line 8 * * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]US4256801 (CHULUDA PHILIP A) [Y] 1-4,7,9,10 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 68 * * example 1 *; | [Y]DE4211010 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,9 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 17 *; | [A]US4743634 (ROYER JAMES R [US]) [A] 1-4,10 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 68 * * column 5, line 30 - line 52 *; | [A] - S.SPILIADIS, "Garniture de freins à hautes performances contenant de la pulpe de kevlar", INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMOBILE, COURBEVOIE (FR), vol. 653, pages 72 - 77, XP000163274 [A] * abstract * | Opposition | EP0352363 | EP0637698 | EP0264096 | US4374211 | - SAE-Technical Paper Series,"Fricton Material for Continuous Slip Torque Converter Applications:Anti-Shudder Considerations", 941031,R.C.Lam et Yih-Fand Chen, Borg-Warner Automotive, 28.02.-03.03.1994 |