04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
18.07.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
15.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
15.02.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
26.07.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
16.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
22.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.09.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] |
03.07.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
29.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.12.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
07.12.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.10.2000 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
19.07.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
30.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
03.03.1999 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
18.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.12.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
28.09.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
29.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.1996 |
First examination report |
|
18.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.10.1996 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] |
01.12.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |
01.12.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |