EP0692289 - Separating solutes from solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC Risley Warrington Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC Risley Warrington, Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | ||
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC Risley Warrington Cheshire, WA3 6AS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burford, Mark D. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | 02 /
Clifford, Anthony A. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | 03 /
Bartle, Keith D. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | 04 /
Cowey, Catherine M. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | 05 /
Smart, Neil, G. c/o British Nuclear Fuels PLC Springfield Works Salwick, Preston PR4 OXJ / GB | [1996/48] |
Former [1996/03] | 01 /
Burford, Mark D. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | ||
02 /
Clifford, Anthony A. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | |||
03 /
Bartle, Keith D. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | |||
04 /
Cowey, Catherine M. c/o School of Chemistry, University of Leeds Leeds, LS2 9JT / GB | Representative(s) | Chalk, Anthony John, et al HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Chalk, Anthony John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1996/03] | McCormack, Derek James British Nuclear Fuels plc, Patents Section, Legal Department Risley, Warrington, Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304262.9 | 20.06.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | GB19940013875 | 09.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9413875 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692289 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692289 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/02, B01D11/04 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
B01D11/0407 (EP,US);
B01D11/0203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | Trennung von gelösten Stoffen aus Lösungen | [1996/03] | English: | Separating solutes from solutions | [1996/03] | French: | Séparation des solutés de solutions | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 20.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Request for further processing for: | 28.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2000 | Decision despatched | 09.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 10.03.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.09.2002 | FR | 11.09.2002 | IT | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | NL | 11.09.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | DE | 12.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 11.09.2002 | |
FR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | CH | 11.09.2002 | |
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | CH | 11.09.2002 | |
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 11.09.2002 | |
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 11.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0135743 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 4, lines 12-22 - page 5, lines 15-34; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0595443 (ISCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP0543471 (ISCO INC [US]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0466291 (ISCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [D]US5268103 (JAMESON DANIEL G [US], et al); | [AD]WO9206058 (DIONEX CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP0384969 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0384969 | US5205987 | WO9206058 | US5268103 | US5203987 | - M. SAITO, T. HONDO, Y. YAMAUCHI, "Supercritical Fluid Chromatography", RSC Chromatography Monographs, LONDON, (1989), page 203 | WO1991GB95008 |