EP0690396 - Apparatus and method for analyzing circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1996/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldmann, Peter 2 Troy Drive Short Hills, New Jersey 07078 / US | 02 /
Freund, Roland Wilhelm 153 Stoneridge Drive, New Providence New Jersey 07974 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304267.8 | 20.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940269230 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 269230 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690396 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
G06F30/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/01] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Analyse von Schaltungen | [1996/01] | English: | Apparatus and method for analyzing circuits | [1996/01] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour l'analyse de circuits | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 03.11.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5313398 (ROHRER RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 11, line 33 - column 12, line 12 * | [DA] - RAGHAVAN ET AL, "awe-inspired", PROCCEDINGS OF THE 1993 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, SAN DIEGO CA US, (19930509), doi:doi:10.1109/CICC.1993.590744, pages 18.1.1 - 18.1.8, XP010222145 [DA] 1,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CICC.1993.590744 | [DA] - FREUND ET AL, "an implementation of the look-ahead lanczos algorithm for non -hemitian marices", SIAM JOURNAL ON SCIENTIFIC COMPUTING, US, vol. 14, no. 1, pages 137 - 158 [DA] 1,7 * the whole document * | [PX] - FELDMANN ET AL, "EFFICIENT LINEAR CIRCUIT ANALYSIS BY PADE APPROXIMATION VIA THE LANCZOS PROCESS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, vol. 14, no. 5, pages 639 - 649 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | - L.T. PILLAGE, R.A. ROHRER, "Asymptotic Waveform Evaluation for Timing Analysis", IEEE TRANS. COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN, (199004), vol. CAD-9, pages 352 - 366 | - C. LANCZOS, "An Iteration Method for the Solution of the Eigenvalue Problem of Linear Differential and Integral Operators", J. RES. NAT. BUR. STANDARDS, (1950), vol. 45, pages 255 - 282 | - R.W. FREUND, "The Look-Ahead Lanczos Process for Large Nonsymmetric Matrices and Related Algorithms", Linear Algebra for large scale and real-time applications, DORDRECHT THE NETHERLANDS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1993), pages 137 - 163, XP000541908 | - H. HEEB ET AL., "Three-Dimensional Circuit Oriented Electromagnetic Modeling for VLSI Interconnects", Proc. of the 1992 IEEE Intern. Conf. on Computer Design: VLSI in Computers & processors, (199210), pages 218 - 221, ISBN 218 | - R.W. FREUND ET AL., "An Implementation of the Look-Ahead Lanczos Algorithm for Non-Hermitian Matrices", SIAM J. SCI. COMPT., (1993), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1137/0914009, pages 137 - 158, XP000541899 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1137/0914009 | - E. CHIPROUT ET AL., "Generalized Moment-Matching Methods for Transient Analysis of Interconnect Networks", Proc. of the 29th AMC/IEEE Design automation Conf., (199206), pages 201 - 206, doi:doi:10.1109/DAC.1992.227836, XP000541400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DAC.1992.227836 |