EP0691682 - Fired body for and manufacture of a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi Nagano 380 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 711, Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano 380 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiuchi, Michio, c/o Shinko Elect. Ind. Co., Ltd. 711 Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Yukiharu, c/o Shinko Elect. Ind. Co.Ltd. 711 Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Harayama, Yoichi, c/o Shinko Elect. Ind. Co., Ltd. 711 Aza Shariden, Oaza Kurita Nagano-shi, Nagano / JP | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304382.5 | 22.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | JP19940152366 | 04.07.1994 Original published format: JP 15236694 | JP19950033499 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: JP 3349995 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0691682 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0691682 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691682 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/538, H01L21/48, H01L23/498, H01L23/13 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
H05K3/0011 (EP,US);
H01L23/02 (KR);
H01L21/486 (EP,US);
H01L23/49861 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (KR);
H05K3/4038 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10287 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0235 (EP,US);
H05K2203/308 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | H01L23/538, H01L21/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/02] | Title | German: | Sinterteil für und Herstellung eines Substrates | [1996/02] | English: | Fired body for and manufacture of a substrate | [1996/02] | French: | Matériau fritté pour substrat et sa fabrication | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00309912.4 / EP1083594 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH02267989 ; | [Y]JPH0393290 ; | [A]US5240671 (CAREY DAVID H [US]) [A] 6,15,16 * column W *; | [A]DE1227965 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62139345 ; | [A]DE3340926 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910118), vol. 15, no. 22, Database accession no. (E - 1024), & JP02267989 A 00000000 (NGK) [X] 1-4,7,9-14 * abstract * [Y] 18 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910711), vol. 15, no. 273, Database accession no. (E - 1088), & JP0393290 A 00000000 (FUJITSU) [Y] 18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871128), vol. 11, no. 367, Database accession no. (E - 561), & JP62139345 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA) [A] * abstract * | Examination | - The Penguin Dictionary of Chemistry, Ed. D.W.A. Sharp, Penguin Books, 1983, page 88 |