EP0690478 - Electron tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kyushima, Hiroyuki, c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304558.0 | 28.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | JP19940146639 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14663994 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690478 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690478 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/22 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
H01J43/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/01] | Title | German: | Elektronenröhre | [1996/01] | English: | Electron tube | [1996/01] | French: | Tube électronique | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0154688 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,9,11,12 * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 19; figure - *; | [DYA]EP0551767 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [DY] 1,2,9,11,12 * column A; figure - * [A] 6-8,10 | by applicant | JPH05182631 | JPH02291654 | JPH02291655 |