blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0695085

EP0695085 - Method and apparatus for hemispheric imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Baker, Robert Grover
2112 NW 1st Avenue
Delray Beach, FL 33444-4341 / US
02 / Flattery Freedenburg, Candace Joy
63 Worral Avenue
Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US
03 / Kettler, Kevin
611 Montclair Street
Pittsburg, PA 15217 / US
04 / Suarez, Gustavo Armando
21482 Woodchuck Lane
Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US
05 / Uplinger, Kenneth Allen
10202 Lockleven Cove
Austin, TX 78750 / US
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Burt, Roger James
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]Burt, Roger James, Dr.
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date95304930.114.07.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateUS1994028133127.07.1994         Original published format: US 281331
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695085
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695085
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1995
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/262, G02B13/06
[1996/05]
CPC:
H04N7/142 (EP,US); G02B13/06 (EP,US); G02B3/0087 (EP,US);
G02B6/04 (EP,US); G02B6/06 (EP,US); H04N5/2628 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur hemisphärischen Bildaufnahme[1996/05]
English:Method and apparatus for hemispheric imaging[1996/05]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour prise de vues hémisphériques[1996/05]
Examination procedure28.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/30]
22.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.1999Fee for grant paid
21.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH16.02.2000
LI16.02.2000
NL16.02.2000
SE16.05.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2001/09]CH16.02.2000
LI16.02.2000
SE16.05.2000
Former [2000/52]CH16.02.2000
LI16.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO9221208  (TELEROBOTICS INT INC [US]) [DY] 1,10 * page 1, line 1 - page 9, line 25 *;
 [Y]WO8903076  (SECRETARY TRADE IND BRIT [GB]) [Y] 1,10 * page 4, line 10 - line 16 *;
 [A]EP0574325  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1,4,5,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 18 * * column 3, line 35 - line 45 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 33 *;
 [A]EP0547635  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 4 - line 18 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 3 - line 33 * * column 6, line 39 - line 44 *;
 [A]US4832472  (ROBB PAUL N [US]) [A] 9 * column 2, line 45 - line 53 *;
 [A]JPH1163079
 [A]  - GILBERT ET AL., "Endoscopic inspection and measurement", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, APPLICATIONS OF DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING XV, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, vol. 1771, pages 106 - 112 [A] 1-3,10 * page 106, line 24 - page 108, line 10 *
 [A]  - GREGUSS ET AL., "PALIMADAR: a PAL-optic based imaging modul for allround data acquisition and recording", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, APPLICATIONS OF DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING XV, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, vol. 1771, pages 567 - 573 [A] 1-3,10 * page 567, line 17 - page 569, line 43 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890921), vol. 13, no. 425, Database accession no. (M - 873), & JP1163079 A 19890627 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 9 * abstract *
by applicantUS4125862
 US4442453
 US5185667
 US4170400
    - "Scaling a Design", SMITH W.J., Modern Lens Design, MCGRAW-HILL, INC., (1992), CH.5.4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.