EP0694881 - Efficient methods for the interpretation of a graphical programming language [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states CANON INFORMATION SYSTEMS RESEARCH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Politis, George c/o Canon Information Systems Research Australia PTY LTD. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | 02 /
Long, Timothy Merrick c/o Canon Information Syst. Research Australia PTY LTD. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde New South Wales 2113 / AU | [2003/12] |
Former [1996/05] | 01 /
Politis, George /o Canon Information Systems Research Australia PTY LTD. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | ||
02 /
Long, Timothy Merrick c/o Canon Information Syst. Research Australia PTY LTD. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde New South Wales 2113 / AU | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305144.8 | 24.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | AU1994PM07044 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: AU PM704494 | [1999/10] |
Former [1996/05] | AU1995PM07044 | 25.07.1994 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0694881 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0694881 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | [1996/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694881 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60, G06F9/44 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/05] | G06T11/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Effizientes Verfahren zum Interpretieren graphischer Programmiersprache | [1996/05] | English: | Efficient methods for the interpretation of a graphical programming language | [1996/05] | French: | Procédé efficace pour l'interprétation d'un langage de programmation graphique | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0325417 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 27 - line 42 * * claims 4,5 *; | [X]EP0528631 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 23, line 32 - column 24, line 6 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 23; claim 1 * * column 8, line 28 - column 10, line 20 *; | [PA]EP0647921 (XEROX CORP [US]) [PA] 1 * page 5, paragraph A3 * * page 8, paragraph A6 * * page 10, paragraph C2; figure 17 *; | [A] - SCHONHUT J ET AL, "Constructive page description", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, MARCH 1991, USA, ISSN 0272-1716, vol. 11, no. 2, pages 71 - 78, XP002003654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.75593 | [A] - WILLIAMS C S ET AL, "A visual language for image processing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1990 IEEE WORKSHOP ON VISUAL LANGUAGES (CAT. NO.90TH0330-1), SKOKIE, IL, USA, 4-6 OCT. 1990, ISBN 0-8186-2090-0, 1990, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC, USA, pages 86 - 91, XP002003655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WVL.1990.128387 | [A] - ROBINSON P J ET AL, "STANDARD PAGE DESCRIPTION LANGUAGE", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (19890401), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 85 - 92, XP000120295 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(89)90062-5 | Examination | US5307452 | - SHANTZIS M.A., "A model for efficient and flexible image computing.", PROCEEDINGS OF 21ST INTERNATIONAL SIGGRAPH CONFERENCE, ORLANDO USA, (19990724), pages 147 - 154 | by applicant | - "Compositing Digital Images", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (198407), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 253 - 259 |