EP0695963 - Acousto-optical tunable filter and a laser tuned by it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aronson, Lewis B. 794 Manor Way Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2000/47] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES, 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | ||
Former [1996/06] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305197.6 | 25.07.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | US19940283455 | 01.08.1994 Original published format: US 283455 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695963 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695963 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/125, G02F1/035, H01S3/106 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/125 (EP,US);
H01S3/1068 (EP,US);
G02F1/035 (EP,US);
G02F2201/12 (EP,US);
G02F2203/055 (EP,US);
H01S3/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/06] | Title | German: | Akustooptischer abstimmbarer Filter und durch diesen abgestimmter Laser | [1996/06] | English: | Acousto-optical tunable filter and a laser tuned by it | [1996/06] | French: | Filtre acousto-optique accordable et laser accordé par ce filtre | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH04159516 ; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920918), vol. 016, no. 451, Database accession no. (P - 1424), & JP04159516 A 19920602 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,14 * abstract * * idem * [Y] 3,11-13,16-18 | [YD] - TRUTNA W R JR ET AL, "Anomalous sidelobes and birefringence apodization in acousto-optic tunable filters", OPTICS LETTERS, 1 JAN. 1993, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 18, no. 1, pages 28 - 30, XP000328269 [YD] 3,11-13,16-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - SMITH D A ET AL, "Acoustically tuned erbium-doped fiber ring laser", OPTICS LETTERS, 15 MARCH 1991, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 16, no. 6, pages 387 - 389, XP000176156 [Y] 16-18 * abstract * | [A] - ARONSON L B ET AL, "Reduced sidelobe integrated acousto-optic filter with birefringence apodization", OPTICS LETTERS, 15 OCT. 1993, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 18, no. 20, pages 1721 - 1723, XP000398571 [A] 1-3,11-13,16-18 * the whole document * | [PX] - ARONSON L B, "Electro-optic tuning and sidelobe control in acousto-optic tunable filters", OPTICS LETTERS, 1 JAN. 1995, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 20, no. 1, pages 46 - 48, XP000481042 [PX] 1-5,8-15 * the whole document * |